VT H0171 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 5, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 5, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to expungement
Title
An act relating to expungement
Sponsors
Rep. Maxine Grad [D] | Rep. Thomas Burditt [R] | Rep. Charles Conquest [D] | Rep. Martin LaLonde [D] |
Rep. Ruqaiyah Morris [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-02 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 89, Nays = 51 (Y: 55 N: 86 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 61, Nays = 81 (Y: 55 N: 86 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 55, Nays = 86 (Y: 55 N: 86 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 61, Nays = 81 (Y: 55 N: 86 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 55, Nays = 86 (Y: 55 N: 86 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on June 5, 2017 |
2017-06-05 | House | Signed by Governor on June 5, 2017 |
2017-05-30 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 30, 2017 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | House message House adopted Conference Committee report |
2017-05-05 | House | Committee of Conference report adopted (House bill) |
2017-05-05 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Sears for Committee, text |
2017-05-04 | Senate | New Business/Committee of Conference Report |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Committee of Conference Report |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Nitka, Sears, and Benning |
2017-04-14 | Senate | House message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed |
2017-04-13 | House | Speaker appointed Lalonde of South Burlington, Conquest of Newbury and Willhoit of St. Johnsbury as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2017-04-13 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Lalonde of South Burlington |
2017-04-13 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment considered |
2017-04-11 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2017-04-06 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Benning for Committee on Judiciary |
2017-04-07 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-04-05 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-02 | House | Passed |
2017-03-02 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 89, Nays = 51 |
2017-03-02 | House | Read Third time |
2017-03-02 | House | Second instance of amendment disagreed to |
2017-03-02 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 61, Nays = 81 |
2017-03-02 | House | First Instance of amendment disagreed to |
2017-03-02 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 55, Nays = 86 |
2017-03-02 | House | Rep. Lucke of Hartford asked that the question be divided |
2017-03-02 | House | Rep. Browning of Arlington moved to amend the bill |
2017-03-02 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2017-03-02 | House | Rep. Murphy of Fairfax and Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the bill |
2017-03-01 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-03-01 | House | Report of Committee on Judiciary agreed to. |
2017-03-01 | House | Rep. Lalonde of South Burlington reported for the committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-01 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-02-01 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |