VT H0154 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 22, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 22, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to approval of amendments to the charter of the City of Burlington and to charter amendment procedure
Title
An act relating to approval of amendments to the charter of the City of Burlington and to charter amendment procedure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by Governor on May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-17 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 17, 2017 |
2017-05-04 | House | Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended & action messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2017-05-04 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Pearson for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Government Operations per Temporary Senate Rule 44A |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-05-01 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2017-05-01 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2017-04-28 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-04-28 | House | Which was agreed to |
2017-04-28 | House | Rep. Hubert of Milton moved to amend the bill |
2017-04-28 | House | Rep. Lewis of Berlin reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2017-04-28 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-01-31 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |