VT H0146 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - House message: Governor approved bill on April 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - House message: Governor approved bill on April 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to increasing the number of examiners on the Board of Bar Examiners from nine to 11 members
Title
An act relating to increasing the number of examiners on the Board of Bar Examiners from nine to 11 members
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on April 30, 2019 |
2019-04-30 | House | Signed by Governor on April 30, 2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Delivered to the Governor on April 24, 2019 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2019-04-10 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2019-04-05 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-04-04 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Baruth for Committee on Judiciary with proposal of amendment |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-03 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-12 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2019-02-08 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-02-08 | House | Rep. Notte of Rutland City reported for the committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-08 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-02-01 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |