VT H0145 | 2023-2024 | Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - House message: Governor allowed to become law without signature on March 20, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to fiscal year 2023 budget adjustments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to fiscal year 2023 budget adjustments

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-22SenateHouse message: Governor allowed to become law without signature on March 20, 2023
2023-03-21HouseAllowed to become law without the signature of the Governor on March 20, 2023
2023-03-14HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 14, 2023
2023-03-14SenateHouse message: House adopted Conference Committee report
2023-03-03HouseRep. McCoy of Poultney moved to deliver the bill to the Governor forthwith, which was agreed to
2023-03-03HouseCommittee of Conference report adopted (House bill)
2023-03-03HouseAction Calendar: Report of Committee of Conference
2023-03-02HouseNotice Calendar: Report of Committee of Conference
2023-03-01HouseSenate Message, report of Committee of Conference adopted
2023-03-01SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza
2023-03-01SenateCommittee of Conference report adopted
2023-03-01SenateCommittee of Conference report submitted by Senator Kitchel for Committee, text
2023-03-01SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Mazza
2023-03-01SenateCommittee of Conference report
2023-03-01SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2023-02-24HouseSenate Message, Committee of Conference members appointed
2023-02-24SenateCommittee of Conference appointed: Senators Kitchel, Perchlik, and Westman
2023-02-24SenateHouse message: House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed
2023-02-24HouseWhich was agreed to
2023-02-24HouseRep McCoy of Poultney moved to suspend rules and message actions to the Senate forthwith
2023-02-24HouseSpeaker appointed Lanpher of Vergennes, Scheu of Middlebury, and Squirrell of Underhill as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House
2023-02-24HouseWhich was agreed to
2023-02-24HouseRep. Lanpher of Vergennes moved the House refuse to concur and asked for a Committee of Conference
2023-02-24HouseAction Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment
2023-02-23HouseNotice Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment
2023-02-22HouseSenate Message, passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2023-02-21SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2023-02-21SenatePending third reading, motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment disagreed to
2023-02-21SenatePending third reading, Senator(s) Vyhovsky and Wrenner motion to amend proposal of amendment; text
2023-02-21SenatePending third reading, motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment agreed to
2023-02-21SenatePending third reading, Senator(s) Kitchel, Baruth, Lyons, Perchlik, Sears, Starr, and Westman motion to amend proposal of amendment; text
2023-02-21SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Kitchel, Baruth, Lyons, Perchlik, Sears, Starr, and Westman
2023-02-21SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2023-02-17Senate3rd reading ordered
2023-02-17SenateCommittee on Appropriations proposal of amendment agreed to on roll call requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0
2023-02-17SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations
2023-02-17SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2023-02-17SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2023-02-16SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2023-02-16SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2023-02-08SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Appropriations
2023-02-03HouseRead third time and passed
2023-02-03HouseRep. Toof of St. Albans Town asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment
2023-02-03HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Donahue of Northfield disagreed to
2023-02-03HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Beck of St. Johnsbury disagreed to
2023-02-03HouseAction Calendar: Third reading
2023-02-02HouseThird Reading ordered
2023-02-02HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 107, Nays = 33
2023-02-02HouseRep. Lanpher of Vergennes demanded yeas and nays
2023-02-02HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Clifford of Rutland City disagreed to
2023-02-02HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. McCarthy of St. Albans City, Marcotte of Coventry, and Durfee of Shaftsbury agreed to
2023-02-02HouseRep. Lanpher of Vergennes spoke for the Committee on Appropriations
2023-02-02HouseRead second time
2023-02-02HouseAction Calendar: Committee bill for second reading
2023-02-01HouseNotice Calendar: Committee bill for second reading
2023-01-31HouseCommittee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on February 1, 2023

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback