VT H0101 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Signed by Governor on 6/7/13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To Hunting, Fishing, And Trapping

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To Hunting, Fishing, And Trapping

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-15HouseSigned by Governor on 6/7/13
2013-05-08HousePassed the House and Senate on 5/8/2013
2013-05-08SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell
2013-05-08SenateHouse proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in
2013-05-08SenateHouse proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text
2013-05-08SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell
2013-05-08SenateHouse proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment
2013-05-08SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2013-05-07SenateHouse message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment
2013-05-07HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2013-05-07HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. McCullough of Williston
2013-05-02SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2013-05-02SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2013-05-01Senate3rd reading ordered
2013-05-01SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy agreed to
2013-05-01SenateReported favorably by Senator MacDonald for Committee on Finance
2013-05-01SenateReported favorably by Senator Rodgers for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy with proposal of amendment
2013-05-01SenateFavorable report by Committee on Finance
2013-05-01SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2013-05-01SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2013-04-30SenateFavorable report by Committee on Finance
2013-04-30SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2013-04-30SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2013-04-26SenateReferred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
2013-04-25SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2013-04-25SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2013-04-12SenateCommittee on Rules relieved; bill committed to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy on motion of Senator Campbell
2013-04-10SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules
2013-04-05HouseRead Third time and Passed
2013-04-05HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. McCullough of Williston agreed to
2013-04-05HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Johnson of Canaan agreed to
2013-04-04HouseThird Reading Ordered
2013-04-04HouseReport of Committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources as amended agreed to
2013-04-04HouseRep. Johnson of Canaan, Malcolm of Pawlet, Smith of New Haven, and Winters of Williamstown moved to amend the report of the committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources, which was agreed to.
2013-04-04HouseRep. Masland of Thetford reported for the committee on Ways and Means
2013-03-12HouseRep. Rep. McCullough of Williston reported for the committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources
2013-04-04HouseRead Second Time
2013-03-12HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
2013-01-29HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback