VT H0089 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 17, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to limiting liability for agritourism

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to limiting liability for agritourism

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on May 17, 2021
2021-05-17HouseSigned by Governor on May 17, 2021
2021-05-11HouseDelivered to the Governor on May 11, 2021
2021-04-30HouseSenate Message, passed in concurrence
2021-04-29SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence
2021-04-28SenateReported favorably by Senator White for Committee on Judiciary, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
2021-04-29SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2021-04-28SenateFavorable report by Committee on Judiciary
2021-04-28SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2021-04-27SenateFavorable report by Committee on Judiciary
2021-04-27SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2021-02-25SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-02-23HouseRead Third time and passed
2021-02-19HouseThird Reading ordered
2021-02-19HouseReport of Committee on Agriculture and Forestry agreed to
2021-02-19HouseRep. Surprenant of Barnard reported for the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry
2021-02-19HouseRead Second time
2021-01-20HouseRead First Time and referred to the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback