VT H0075 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - Referred to Committee on Government Operations per Temporary Senate Rule 44A
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - Referred to Committee on Government Operations per Temporary Senate Rule 44A
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the Government Accountability Committee and the State Outcomes Report
Title
An act relating to the Government Accountability Committee and the State Outcomes Report
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Government Operations per Temporary Senate Rule 44A |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-02-16 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2017-02-15 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-02-15 | House | Rep. Brumsted of Shelburne recommended for the committee on Government Operations |
2017-02-15 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-01-19 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |