VT H0058 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-7)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - House message: Governor approved bill on 5/17/17
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-7)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - House message: Governor approved bill on 5/17/17
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to permanent licenses for persons 66 years of age or older
Title
An act relating to permanent licenses for persons 66 years of age or older
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on 5/17/17 |
2017-05-17 | House | Signed by Governor on May 17, 2017 |
2017-05-11 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 11, 2017 |
2017-05-04 | House | Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2017-05-04 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2017-05-03 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Campion for Committee on Finance |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Rodgers for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Mazza |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2017-02-02 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2017-02-01 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-02-01 | House | Report of Committee on Natural Resources, Fish & Wildlife as amended agreed to |
2017-02-01 | House | Report of the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish & Wildlife amended as recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-02-01 | House | Rep. Canfield of Fair Haven recommended for the committee on Ways and Means |
2017-02-01 | House | Rep. McCullough of Williston reported for the committee on Natural Resources, Fish & Wildlife |
2017-02-01 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-01-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2017-01-17 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish & Wildlife |