VT H0047 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-01 - Delivered to the Governor on 3/4/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-01 - Delivered to the Governor on 3/4/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Fiscal Year 2013 Budget Adjustment
Title
An Act Relating To Fiscal Year 2013 Budget Adjustment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-01 | House | Delivered to the Governor on 3/4/2013 |
2013-03-12 | House | Signed by Governor on 3/7/2013 |
2013-02-26 | House | Passed the House and Senate on 2/26/2013 |
2013-02-22 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2013-02-22 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment |
2013-02-21 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2013-02-20 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment |
2013-02-19 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Heath of Westford |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senator Sears requested & granted leave to withdraw amendment |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Sears motion to amend proposal of amendment; text |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Pending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears |
2013-02-12 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2013-02-08 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations agreed to |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2013-02-08 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-01-23 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2013-01-23 | House | Which was agreed to |
2013-01-23 | House | Rep. Heath of Westford and Brennan of Colchester moved to amend the bill |
2013-01-22 | House | Rep. Rep. Heath of Westford spoke for the committee on Appropriations |
2013-01-22 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2013-01-22 | House | Read Second Time |
2013-01-22 | House | Rep. Turner of Milton moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration |
2013-01-18 | House | Placed on Calendar for Notice on 1/18/2013 |