VT H0039 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-02 - Committee of Conference appointed: Senators MacDonald, Lyons, and Snelling
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-02 - Committee of Conference appointed: Senators MacDonald, Lyons, and Snelling
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To The Public Service Board And The Department Of Public Service
Title
An Act Relating To The Public Service Board And The Department Of Public Service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - Senate - Shall the Senate proposal of amendment be amended by striking out Secs. 14 and 15, as moved by Senator Ayer? (Y: 5 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Shall sections 14 and 15 be stricken? (Y: 5 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Shall sections 14 and 15 be stricken? (Y: 5 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators MacDonald, Lyons, and Snelling |
2013-05-01 | Senate | House message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed |
2013-05-06 | House | Speaker appointed Cheney of Norwich to replace Klein of East Montpelier on the Committee of Conference |
2013-04-30 | House | Speaker appointed Botzow of Pownal, Marcotte of Coventry and Klein of East Montpelier as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2013-04-30 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Carr of Brandon |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Bray and Ayer motion to amend proposal of amendment; text |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senator Galbraith requested & granted leave to withdraw amendment |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senator Rodgers requested & granted leave to withdraw substitution of amendment |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senator Ashe requested & granted leave to withdraw motion |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senator Ashe motion to order bill to lie |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senator(s) Rodgers motion to substitute proposal of amendment; text |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment offered by Senator(s) Galbraith |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senate proposal of amendment amended as moved by Senator(s) Rodgers |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Pending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Bray and Ayer |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Pending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Galbraith |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Pending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Rodgers |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Pending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Galbraith |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Pending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Rodgers |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Pending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Galbraith |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Pending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Rodgers |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Pending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Galbraith |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Pending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Rodgers |
2013-04-18 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senator Galbraith requested roll call on motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment; disagreed to Failed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 5, Nays = 23 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senator(s) Ayer motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment; text |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senator Rodgers requested & granted leave to withdraw motion to amend Committe on Finance proposal of amendment |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senator(s) Rodgers motion to amend Committee on Finance proposal of amendment; text |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Ashe for Committee on Finance |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Rodgers |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2013-04-17 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed |
2013-02-15 | House | Read Third time |
2013-02-14 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2013-02-14 | House | Amendment of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development agreed to |
2013-02-14 | House | Rep. Carr of Brandon reported for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2013-02-14 | House | Read Second Time |
2013-01-18 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development |