VT H0018 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-27 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-27 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Granting Staff Of The Departments Of Corrections And For Children And Families Ex Officio Status For Notary Public Services
Title
An Act Relating To Granting Staff Of The Departments Of Corrections And For Children And Families Ex Officio Status For Notary Public Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-02-21 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2013-02-22 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2013-02-21 | House | Rep. Mook of Bennington reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2013-02-21 | House | Read Second Time |
2013-01-15 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |