Bill Text: VA SJR390 | 2017 | Regular Session | Enrolled
Bill Title: Governor; confirming appointments.
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: (Passed) 2017-02-21 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ390ER) [SJR390 Detail]
Download: Virginia-2017-SJR390-Enrolled.html
RESOLVED by the Senate, the House of Delegates concurring, That the General Assembly confirm the following appointments of certain persons made by Governor Terry McAullife after January 7, 2017, and communicated to the General Assembly February 7, 2017.
Amy L. Solares, 4336 Cattingham Lane, Virginia Beach, Virginia 23456, Member, appointed January 25, 2017, to serve an unexpired term beginning September 14, 2016, and ending June 30, 2018, to succeed Elizabeth A. Sword.
James Andrew Darden, 6407 Joyner's Bridge Road, Carrsville, Virginia 23315, Member, appointed January 26, 2017, for a term of four years beginning July 1, 2016, and ending June 30, 2020, to succeed Robert O. Alphin.
Ann W. Templeman, 61 Linden Avenue, Hampton, Virginia 23669, Member, appointed January 25, 2017, to serve an unexpired term beginning January 6, 2017, and ending June 7, 2020, to succeed Susan M. Rotkis.
Laura L. Kleiner, 101 Stafford Street, Staunton, Virginia 24401, Member, appointed January 25, 2017, for a term of four years beginning July 1, 2016, and ending June 30, 2020, to succeed Faye Prichard.
Donald L. Hart, Jr., 18389 North Street, Keller, Virginia 23401, Member, appointed January 19, 2017, to serve an unexpired term beginning September 25, 2016, and ending June 30, 2017, to succeed Kyle McDaniel.
James A. Meadows, Jr., 508 Harold's Drive, Manakin-Sabot, Virginia 23103, Member, appointed January 12, 2017, for a term of four years beginning July 1, 2016, and ending June 30, 2020, to succeed David L. Gilliam.
Randolph T. Minter, 7253 Windsor Court, Warrenton, Virginia 20186, Member, appointed January 12, 2017, for a term of four years beginning July 1, 2016, and ending June 30, 2020, to succeed himself.
R. Michael Amyx, 11850 Aberdeen Landing Terrace, Midlothian, Virginia 23113, Member, appointed February 1, 2017, for a term of five years beginning January 1, 2017, and ending December 31, 2021, to succeed John T. Stirrup.
Janel E. Hofler, 5603 Darby Close, Portsmouth, Virginia 23703, Member, appointed January 26, 2017, for a term of four years beginning April 3, 2016, and ending April 2, 2020, to succeed H. René Fonseca.
Chris King, 3313 Wyndham Circle #2219, Alexandria, Virginia 22302, Member, appointed January 26, 2017, for a term of four years beginning April 3, 2016, and ending April 2, 2020, to succeed Christopher S. Call.
Rex E. McCarty, 236 Homeplace Drive, Gate City, Virginia 24251, Member, appointed January 26, 2017, for a term of four years beginning April 3, 2016, and ending April 2, 2020, to succeed H. Glenn James.
Richard D. Stuchell, 10012 Shadowridge Court, Fredericksburg, Virginia 22407, Member, appointed January 26, 2017, for a term of four years beginning April 3, 2016, and ending April 2, 2020, to succeed Scott Mayausky.
Margaret D. Davis, 1404 12th Street North, Apartment 22, Arlington, Virginia 22209, Member, appointed January 25, 2017, for a term of four years beginning July 1, 2016, and ending June 30, 2020, to succeed Jennifer Barton Boysko.
Ibrahim A. Moiz, 20747 Bridalveil Falls Terrace, Sterling, Virginia 20165, Member, appointed January 25, 2017, to serve an unexpired term beginning June 16, 2016, and ending June 30, 2018, to succeed Antonio M. Elias.
Edwin Leigh Armistead, 1624 Wakefield Drive, Virginia Beach, Virginia 23455, Member, appointed January 12, 2017, for a term of three years beginning June 21, 2016, and ending June 20, 2019, to succeed Steven Foster.
Robert B. Benson, 18 Ivy Spring Lane, Fredericksburg, Virginia 22406, Member, appointed January 19, 2017, for a term of three years beginning June 21, 2016, and ending June 20, 2019, to succeed himself.
R. Dudley Harris, 129 James River Drive, Newport News, Virginia 23601, Member, appointed January 19, 2017, for a term of three years beginning June 21, 2015, and ending June 20, 2018, to succeed himself.
Terry Richard Kelly, 1909 Marcia Court, Virginia Beach, Virginia 23464, Member, appointed January 19, 2017, for a term of three years beginning June 21, 2016, and ending June 20, 2019, to succeed himself.
Rebecca R. Leinen, 658 Merry Oaks Lane, Palmyra, Virginia 22963, Member, appointed January 19, 2017, for a term of three years beginning June 21, 2016, and ending June 20, 2019, to succeed John F. Biagas.
Michael L. Mays, 1846 Lovers Lane, Vinton, Virginia 24179, Member, appointed January 19, 2017, for a term of three years beginning June 21, 2016, and ending June 20, 2019, to succeed himself.
Kristen J. Amundson, 3803 Shannons Green Way, Alexandria, Virginia 22309, Member, appointed January 27, 2017, to serve at the pleasure of the Governor, to succeed Antoine Green.
Peter A. Blake, 8847 Riverside Drive, Richmond, Virginia 23235, Member, appointed January 27, 2017, to serve at the pleasure of the Governor, to succeed Artur Davis.
Steven R. Staples, Post Office Box 2120, Richmond, Virginia 23218, Member, appointed January 27, 2017, to serve at the pleasure of the Governor, to succeed Patricia Wright.
Joan E. Wodiska, 166 Rees Place, Falls Church, Virginia 22046, Member, appointed January 27, 2017, to serve at the pleasure of the Governor, to succeed Patricia Harvey.
Victoria Cochran, 2175 Maple Lane, Blacksburg, Virginia 24060, Member, appointed February 3, 2017, to serve at the pleasure of the Governor, to succeed Shelly Shuman-Johnson.
Tashiara Scott, 10013 Pilgrim Court, Richmond, Virginia 23227, Member, appointed January 27, 2017, for a term of three years beginning July 1, 2016, and ending June 30, 2019, to succeed Elsa D. Vasquez-Flores.
Elise Nelson, 10693 Anna Marie Drive, Glen Allen, Virginia 23060, Member, appointed January 20, 2017, to serve an unexpired term beginning May 1, 2016, and ending June 30, 2018, to succeed Robert Warren.
Lisa M. Beitz, 14002 Southshore Road, Midlothian, Virginia 23112, Member, appointed January 20, 2017, for a term of three years beginning July 1, 2016, and ending June 30, 2019, to succeed herself.
Michael Z. Blumberg, 149 West Square Court, Richmond, Virginia 23238, Member, appointed January 20, 2017, for a term of three years beginning July 1, 2016, and ending June 30, 2019, to succeed himself.
Steven F. Dempsey, 10445 Government Center Boulevard, King George, Virginia 22485, Member, appointed January 20, 2017, for a term of three years beginning July 1, 2016, and ending June 30, 2019, to succeed Humberto I. Cardounel.
Robin Foster, 308 Cheswick Lane, Henrico, Virginia 23229, Member, appointed January 20, 2017, for a term of three years beginning July 1, 2016, and ending June 30, 2019, to succeed herself.
Regina M. Milteer, 8602 Eagle Glen Terrace, Fairfax Station, Virginia 22039, Member, appointed January 20, 2017, for a term of three years beginning July 1, 2016, and ending June 30, 2019, to succeed herself.
Stephanie N. Morales, 1345 Court Street, Suite 105, Portsmouth, Virginia 23705, Member, appointed January 20, 2017, for a term of three years beginning July 1, 2016, and ending June 30, 2019, to succeed Nancy G. Parr.
Elizabeth Ryan-Rodzinka, 1707 3rd Street, Staunton, Virginia 24401, Member, appointed January 20, 2017, for a term of three years beginning July 1, 2016, and ending June 30, 2019, to succeed Francis L. Romero.
Kimberly Sobey, Post Office Box 126, Rural Retreat, Virginia 24368, Member, appointed January 20, 2017, for a term of three years beginning July 1, 2016, and ending June 30, 2019, to succeed herself.
Scott F. Wilkes, 260 Cedar Green Road, Staunton, Virginia 24401, Member, appointed January 20, 2017, for a term of three years beginning July 1, 2016, and ending June 30, 2019, to succeed Jessica Taryn Pickett.
Elizabeth M. O'Shea, 6605 Brawner Street, McLean, Virginia 22101, Member, appointed January 27, 2017, to serve an unexpired term beginning January 6, 2017, and ending June 30, 2019, to succeed Eddie Worth.
Brian Evans, 6009 Chamberlayne Road, Richmond, Virginia 23227, Member, appointed January 13, 2017, for a term of three years beginning October 1, 2016, and ending September 30, 2019, to fill a new seat.
Christine L. Appert, 2400 Arlington Boulevard, Apartment A, Charlottesville, Virginia 22903, Member, appointed February 3, 2017, for a term of three years beginning October 1, 2016, and ending September 30, 2019, to succeed herself.
Irene M. Conlin, 4468 Smokey Lake Drive, Virginia Beach, Virginia 23462, Member, appointed February 3, 2017, for a term of three years beginning October 1, 2016, and ending September 30, 2019, to succeed Michael Davis.
W. Chris Martin, 403 South James Street, Ashland, Virginia 23005, Member, appointed February 3, 2017, for a term of three years beginning October 1, 2016, and ending September 30, 2019, to succeed Valerie Augburn Walker.
Mark W. Roane, 3230 Grove Avenue, Richmond, Virginia 23221, Member, appointed February 3, 2017, for a term of three years beginning October 1, 2016, and ending September 30, 2019, to succeed Bonita Hinrichs.
Allison Coles-Johnson, 3108 River Bluffs Court, Richmond, Virginia 23223, Member, appointed January 27, 2017, to serve an unexpired term beginning July 1, 2015, and ending June 30, 2019, to succeed Sharon Drescher.
Kendall Lee, Post Office Box 382, Kenbridge, Virginia 23944, Member, appointed January 13, 2017, to serve an unexpired term beginning November 1, 2016, and ending September 30, 2018, to succeed Allan Phillips.
Ferhan Hamid, 8879 Olive Mae Circle, Fairfax, Virginia 22031, Member, appointed January 20, 2017, for a term of five years beginning January 15, 2017, and ending January 14, 2022, to succeed himself.
Paige D. Cherry, 4036 Estates Lane, Portsmouth, Virginia 23703, Member, appointed January 31, 2017, to serve an unexpired term beginning December 2, 2016, and ending June 30, 2018, to succeed Donald B. Kaiserman.