VA SJR86 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Passed on February 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ86ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Ovarian Cancer Awareness Month. Designates September, in 2020 and in each succeeding year, as Ovarian Cancer Awareness Month in Virginia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ovarian Cancer Awareness Month.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SJ86ER)
2020-02-24HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-24HouseAgreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-24HouseTaken up
2020-02-19HouseReported from Rules (17-Y 0-N)
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenateAgreed to by Senate by voice vote
2020-02-11SenateReading waived (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-10SenateReading waived (38-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07SenateReported from Rules by voice vote
2020-01-29SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2020-01-29SenatePresented and ordered printed 20100329D
2020-01-29SenateUnanimous consent to introduce

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback