VA SJR8 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-17 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ8ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Celebrating the life of the Honorable Arthur R. Giesen, Jr.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Celebrating the life of the Honorable Arthur R. Giesen, Jr.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-17SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SJ8ER)
2022-01-17SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SJ8ER)
2022-01-17HouseAgreed to by House
2022-01-14HouseLaid on Speaker's table
2022-01-14HouseReceived
2022-01-13SenateAgreed to by Senate
2022-01-13SenateEngrossed by Senate
2022-01-06SenatePrefiled and laid on Clerk's desk; offered 01/12/22 22100208D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback