VA SJR6 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-24 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ6ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-24 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ6ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Honorable Michael J. Cassidy.
Title
Commending the Honorable Michael J. Cassidy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ6ER) |
2022-01-24 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2022-01-21 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2022-01-21 | House | Received |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled and laid on Clerk's desk; offered 01/12/22 22100511D |