VA SJR58 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR58
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Finance and Appropriations
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Finance and Appropriations
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (second resolution); personal property tax exemption; motor vehicle owned by a veteran who is disabled. Provides that one motor vehicle of a veteran who has a 100 percent service-connected, permanent, and total disability shall be exempt from state and local taxes. The amendment provides that only automobiles and pickup trucks qualify for the exemption. Additionally, the exemption is only applicable on the date the motor vehicle is acquired or the effective date of the amendment, whichever is later, and is not applicable for any period of time prior to the effective date of the amendment.
Title
Constitutional amendment; personal property tax exemption for motor vehicle of a disabled veteran.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | Senate | Left in Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107038D-S1 |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Incorporates SJ33 (Reeves) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103837D |
Same As/Similar To
SJR58 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)