VA SJR58 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-14 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ58ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-14 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ58ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Shaken Baby Syndrome Awareness Week. Designates the third week in April, in 2013 and in each succeeding year, as Shaken Baby Syndrome Awareness Week in Virginia.
Title
Shaken Baby Syndrome Awareness Week.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ58ER) | |
2012-02-24 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | House: Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | House: Taken up | |
2012-02-21 | House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-08 | Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-03 | Senate: Reported from Rules by voice vote | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102941D |