VA SJR5 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (second reference); marriage; repeal of same-sex marriage prohibition; affirmative right to marry. Repeals the constitutional provision defining marriage as only a union between one man and one woman as well as the related provisions that are no longer valid as a result of the United States Supreme Court decision in Obergefell v. Hodges, 576 U.S. 644 (2015). The amendment provides that the right to marry is a fundamental right inherent in the liberty of persons and requires the Commonwealth and its political subdivisions and agents to issue marriage licenses, recognize marriages, and treat all marriages equally under the law, regardless of the sex or gender of the parties to the marriage. Religious organizations and clergy acting in their religious capacity have the right to refuse to perform any marriage.
Title
Constitutional amendment; fundamental right to marry, same-sex marriage prohibition.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Sen. Barbara Favola [D] | Sen. Ghazala Hashmi [D] |
Sen. Joseph Morrissey [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 6-N) (Y: 4 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (25-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (25-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2022-03-01 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 6-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate (25-Y 14-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 5-N) |
2021-12-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2021-12-22 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100319D |