VA SJR478 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-07 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ478ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-07 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ478ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Appointment by the Senate Committee on Rules. Confirms the appointment by the Senate Committee on Rules of Angela M. W. Thanyachareon to the Board of the Virginia Office for Protection and Advocacy.
Title
Senate Committee on Rules; confirming appointment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 0-N) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-07 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ478ER) | |
2011-02-26 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-26 | House: Agreed to by House (88-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-26 | House: Taken up | |
2011-02-24 | House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-02-24 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-22 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 11105267D |