VA SJR419 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-07 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ419ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-07 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ419ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
President Ronald Wilson Reagan. Commemorates the 100th anniversary of the birth of President Ronald Wilson Reagan.
Title
Commemorating the 100th anniversary of the birth of President Ronald Wilson Reagan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Rules (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Rules (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-07 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ419ER) | |
2011-02-22 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Taken up | |
2011-02-17 | House: Reported from Rules (11-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-02-09 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Reported from Rules by voice vote | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 11103919D | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Unanimous consent to introduce |