VA SJR350 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-11)
Status: Passed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ350ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-11)
Status: Passed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ350ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Myron Parsek Erkiletian.
Title
Celebrating the life of Myron Parsek Erkiletian.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ350ER) |
2013-01-25 | House | Agreed to by House |
2013-01-18 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2013-01-18 | House | Received |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Presented 13100852D |