VA SJR34 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-17 - Incorporated by Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-17 - Incorporated by Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; recurrent flooding; report. Establishes a 15-member joint subcommittee to formulate recommendations for the development of a comprehensive and coordinated planning effort to address recurrent flooding. The joint subcommittee is charged with recommending short- and long-term strategies for minimizing the impact of recurrent flooding. Its report is to be submitted by November 1, 2015.
Title
Recurrent flooding; joint subcommittee established to formulate recommendations to address.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-17 | Senate | Incorporated by Rules |
2014-01-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101018D |
Same As/Similar To
SJR3 (Similar To) 2014-03-08 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ3ER)
Subjects
Eastern Shore of Virginia
General Assembly
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Tidewater Virginia
Weather
General Assembly
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Tidewater Virginia
Weather
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+SJ34 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+SJ34+hil |