VA SJR3 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-08 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ3ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-08 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ3ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; recurrent flooding; report. Establishes an 11-member joint subcommittee to formulate recommendations for the development of a comprehensive and coordinated planning effort to address recurrent flooding. The joint subcommittee is charged with recommending short- and long-term strategies for minimizing the impact of recurrent flooding. The joint subcommittee must submit its report to the Governor and the 2016 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
Title
Recurrent flooding; joint subcommittee established to formulate recommendations to address.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-08 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ3ER) |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-07 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-07 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 14105635D-S2 |
2014-03-07 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2014-03-06 | House | Delegates: Stolle, Knight, Hester |
2014-03-06 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senators: Locke, McWaters, Watkins |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate acceded to request |
2014-03-06 | House | House requested conference committee |
2014-03-06 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2014-03-06 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate |
2014-03-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-05 | House | Agreed to by House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-05 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SJ3H1 |
2014-03-05 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14105150D-H1 |
2014-03-05 | House | Taken up |
2014-03-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 14105150D-H1 |
2014-03-03 | House | Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-18 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2014-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-01-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ3S1 |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14104138D-S1 |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Incorporates SJ34 |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14104138D-S1 |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote |
2013-12-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-12-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100663D |
Same As/Similar To
SJR34 (Similar To) 2014-01-17 - Incorporated by Rules
HJR16 (Same As) 2014-03-08 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ16ER)
HJR16 (Same As) 2014-03-08 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ16ER)
Subjects
Eastern Shore of Virginia
General Assembly
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Tidewater Virginia
Weather
General Assembly
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Tidewater Virginia
Weather