VA SJR335 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-07 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ335ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-07 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ335ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; long-term dedicated funding sources for land conservation; report. Directs the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to study long-term dedicated funding sources for land conservation. In conducting its study, the Commission is directed to look to other states for innovative funding mechanisms and identify and develop viable options for potential long-term dedicated funding sources for land conservation in the Commonwealth.
Title
Land conservation; JLARC to study long-term dedicated funding sources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-07 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ335ER) | |
2011-02-22 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Taken up | |
2011-02-17 | House: Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-15 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-10 | House: Assigned Rules sub: #3 Studies | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ335S1 | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11104661D-S1 | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-28 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104661D-S1 | |
2011-01-28 | Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote | |
2011-01-14 | Senate: Assigned Rules sub: #1 | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102302D |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Conservation
Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission (JLARC)
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Conservation
Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission (JLARC)
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports