VA SJR322 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SJR322

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Study; Secretary of Administration; State Board of Elections; electronic return of voted military-overseas ballots; pilot program; report. Requests the Secretary of Administration to oversee and develop a charter and directives for the State Board of Elections to form a working group to study implementation of electronic return of voted military-overseas ballots. In conducting its study, the State Board of Elections with the working group shall study and develop initial instructions and procedures that (i) consider issues related to accessibility, auditability, authentication, verification, and security through encryption, in order to ensure that any process implemented would guarantee the accuracy and integrity of voted military-overseas ballots, and (ii) recommend (a) security measures necessary to reasonably secure the transmission, processing, and storage of voter data from interception and unauthorized access; (b) methods for verifying and authenticating the identity of the voter electronically when registering to vote and when requesting a ballot from and returning a ballot to the voter's jurisdiction; (c) methods for the encryption of voted ballots; and (d) a procedure for security reviews after an election. The study shall focus on implementation of electronic return of voted military-overseas ballots first as a limited pilot program in 2022, and later on a statewide basis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military-overseas ballots; electronic return of voted ballots, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (11-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01HouseLeft in Privileges and Elections
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
2021-02-07HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-05SenateAgreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N)
2021-02-05SenateReading waived (37-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-02-04SenateReading waived (38-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateReported from Privileges and Elections (11-Y 3-N 1-A)
2021-01-27SenateRereferred to Privileges and Elections
2021-01-27SenateRereferred from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-01-22SenatePresented and ordered printed 21102039D

Same As/Similar To

SJR322 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback