VA SJR322 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR322
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Secretary of Administration; State Board of Elections; electronic return of voted military-overseas ballots; pilot program; report. Requests the Secretary of Administration to oversee and develop a charter and directives for the State Board of Elections to form a working group to study implementation of electronic return of voted military-overseas ballots. In conducting its study, the State Board of Elections with the working group shall study and develop initial instructions and procedures that (i) consider issues related to accessibility, auditability, authentication, verification, and security through encryption, in order to ensure that any process implemented would guarantee the accuracy and integrity of voted military-overseas ballots, and (ii) recommend (a) security measures necessary to reasonably secure the transmission, processing, and storage of voter data from interception and unauthorized access; (b) methods for verifying and authenticating the identity of the voter electronically when registering to vote and when requesting a ballot from and returning a ballot to the voter's jurisdiction; (c) methods for the encryption of voted ballots; and (d) a procedure for security reviews after an election. The study shall focus on implementation of electronic return of voted military-overseas ballots first as a limited pilot program in 2022, and later on a statewide basis.
Title
Military-overseas ballots; electronic return of voted ballots, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (11-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (11-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote |
2021-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2021-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Reading waived (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (11-Y 3-N 1-A) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Privileges and Elections |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 21102039D |
Same As/Similar To
SJR322 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote