VA SJR285 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Joint Subcommittee to Study Barrier Crimes and Criminal History Records Checks; Report. Continues the Joint Subcommittee to Study Barrier Crimes and Criminal History Records Checks for one additional year, through November 30, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Barrier Crimes and Criminal History Records Checks, Joint Subcommittee Studying; continued.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Rules by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-27SenateRead third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
2021-01-26SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-25SenateReading waived (38-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22SenateReported from Rules by voice vote
2021-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2021-01-11SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100586D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback