VA SJR258 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-22 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ258ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-22 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ258ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Department of Energy; eliminating waste coal piles in Southwest Virginia; report. Requests the Department of Energy to study the economic and environmental impacts of eliminating waste coal piles in Southwest Virginia. Study; Department of Energy; eliminating waste coal piles in Southwest Virginia; report. Requests the Department of Energy to study the economic and environmental impacts of eliminating waste coal piles in Southwest Virginia.
Title
Waste coal; Dept. of Energy to study environment and economic impact of eliminating piles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendment(s) (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendment(s) (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ258ER) |
2023-02-22 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-20 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2023-02-17 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (98-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | House | Agreed to by House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2023-02-17 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2023-02-17 | House | Taken up |
2023-02-14 | House | Reported from Rules with amendment(s) (18-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2023-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2023-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 23104599D-ES1 |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SJ258ES1 |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 23104599D-S1 |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23104599D-S1 |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103817D |