VA SJR249 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-27 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ249ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-27 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ249ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of the Honorable John C. Miller.
Title
Celebrating the life of the Honorable John C. Miller.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ249ER) |
2017-01-27 | House | Agreed to by House |
2017-01-20 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2017-01-20 | House | Received |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2017-01-02 | Senate | Prefiled and laid on Clerk's desk; offered 01/11/17 17100012D |