VA SJR174 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-04 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ174ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-04 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ174ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Merck's Elkton plant.
Title
Commending Merck's Elkton plant.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ174ER) |
2016-03-04 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2016-02-26 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2016-02-26 | House | Received |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Presented 16105626D |