VA SJR17 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-03 - House: Left in Rules
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-03 - House: Left in Rules
Summary
Comprehensive information system to replace or revise the Service Fee Directory. Requests that the Office of Comprehensive Services develop a comprehensive information system that would replace or revise the Service Fee Directory to capture and track, on an ongoing basis, key compliance, performance, and financial information, including rates, about residential services. The Office of Comprehensive Services is requested to make a preliminary report in 2009 and a final report in 2010.
Title
Service Fee Directory; comprehensive information system to replace or revise.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-03 | House: Left in Rules | |
2008-02-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2008-02-11 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 088181220-E | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SJ17E | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote | |
2007-12-19 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2007-12-19 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 088181220 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SJ17 |