VA SJR168 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-14 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ168ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-14 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ168ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Waverly Manson Cole, M.D.
Title
Celebrating the life of Waverly Manson Cole, M.D.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ168ER) | |
2012-02-24 | House: Agreed to by House | |
2012-02-17 | House: Received | |
2012-02-16 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate | |
2012-02-16 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Introduced bill reprinted 12104779D | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Presented 12104779D |