VA SJR162 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ162ER)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ162ER)
Summary
Commending Dr. David T. Clark and the Loudoun Archaeological Foundation.
Title
Commending Dr. David T. Clark and the Loudoun Archaeological Foundation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-17 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ162ER) | |
2008-02-15 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2008-02-14 | House: Laid on Speaker's table | |
2008-02-14 | House: Received | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Introduced bill reprinted 088977240 | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Presented 088977240 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SJ162 |