VA SJR154 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ154ER)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ154ER)
Summary
Celebrating the lives of Ross A. Alameddine, Christopher James Bishop, Brian Roy Bluhm, Ryan Christopher Clark, Austin Michelle Cloyd, Jocelyne Couture-Nowak, Kevin P. Granata, Matthew Gregory Gwaltney, Caitlin Millar Hammaren, Jeremy Michael Herbstritt, Rachael Elizabeth Hill, Emily Jane Hilscher, Jarrett Lee Lane, Matthew Joseph La Porte, Henry J. Lee, Liviu Librescu, G.V. Loganathan, Partahi Mamora Halomoan Lumbantoruan, Lauren Ashley McCain, Daniel Patrick O'Neil, Juan Ramon Ortiz-Ortiz, Minal Hiralal Panchal, Daniel Alejandro Perez, Erin Nicole Peterson, Michael Steven Pohle, Jr., Julia Kathleen Pryde, Mary Karen Read, Reema Joseph Samaha, Waleed Mohamed Shaalan, Leslie Geraldine Sherman, Maxine Shelly Turner, and Nicole Regina White.
Title
Celebrating the lives of those lost in the Virginia Tech tragedy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-17 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ154ER) | |
2008-02-22 | House: Agreed to by House | |
2008-02-22 | House: Taken up for immediate consideration | |
2008-02-21 | House: Laid on Speaker's table | |
2008-02-21 | House: Received | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Introduced bill reprinted 088722348 | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Presented 088722348 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SJ154 |