VA SJR143 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ143ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ143ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending James S. Utterback.
Title
Commending James S. Utterback.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Wagner [R] | Sen. Creigh Deeds [D] | Sen. Janet Howell [D] | Sen. Lynwood Lewis [D] |
Sen. Monty Mason [D] | Sen. Lionell Spruill [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ143ER) |
2018-03-02 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2018-02-23 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2018-02-23 | House | Received |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Presented 18106225D |