VA SB997 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0747)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0747)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Oyster Shell Waste Diversion Fund; created. Creates the Oyster Shell Waste Diversion Fund for the purpose of diverting oyster shells from landfills and promoting the beneficial reuse of such shells in oyster restoration activities. The Fund shall be administered by the Department of Conservation and Recreation, which shall be authorized to contract with an entity that is exempt from taxation pursuant to § 501(c)(3) of the Internal Revenue Code and is engaged in oyster restoration activities to manage Fund operations consistent with the purposes of the Fund. Oyster Shell Waste Diversion Fund; created. Creates the Oyster Shell Waste Diversion Fund for the purpose of diverting oyster shells from landfills and promoting the beneficial reuse of such shells in oyster restoration activities. The Fund shall be administered by the Department of Conservation and Recreation, which shall be authorized to contract with an entity that is exempt from taxation pursuant to § 501(c)(3) of the Internal Revenue Code and is engaged in oyster restoration activities to manage Fund operations consistent with the purposes of the Fund.
Title
Oyster Replenishment Fund; oyster resource user fees to be credited to Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-12 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (82-Y 11-N) (Y: 82 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (78-Y 18-N) (Y: 78 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (78-Y 18-N) (Y: 78 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0747) | |
2023-04-12 | House | Enacted, Chapter 747 (effective 7/1/23) |
2023-04-12 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB997ER2) |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2023-04-12 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2023-04-12 | House | VOTE: Adoption (82-Y 11-N) |
2023-04-12 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (82-Y 11-N) |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Governor's substitute printed 23107684D-S2 |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB997ER) |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Title replaced 23106467D-H1 |
2023-02-20 | Senate | House substitute with amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2023-02-16 | House | VOTE: Passage (78-Y 18-N) |
2023-02-16 | House | Passed House with substitute with amendments (78-Y 18-N) |
2023-02-16 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments SB997H1 |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee on Appropriations amendments agreed to |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources substitute agreed to 23106467D-H1 |
2023-02-16 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-13 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-10 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2023-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-02-08 | House | Committee substitute printed 23106467D-H1 |
2023-02-08 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2023-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB997S1 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 23105621D-S1 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23105621D-S1 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103089D |