VA SB988 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0020)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0020)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Employment Commission; population projections. Eliminates the requirement that the Virginia Employment Commission prepare population projections for the Commonwealth for use by the General Assembly and certain state agencies.
Title
Virginia Employment Commission; population projections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0020) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 20 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2017 | |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/14/17 |
2017-02-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB988ER) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-10 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-07 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101265D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
General Assembly
State Agencies
Unemployment Compensation
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
General Assembly
State Agencies
Unemployment Compensation