VA SB987 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0840)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0840)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real property tax; exemption for disabled veterans. Codifies the constitutional amendment adopted by voters in November 2010 that provides for a property tax exemption for veterans who have a 100 percent, service-related disability. The constitutional amendment requires the General Assembly to enact the exemption in general law. This bill incorporates
Title
Real property tax; exemption for disabled veterans.
Sponsors
Sen. John Edwards [D] | Sen. Janet Howell [D] | Sen. Dave Marsden [D] | Sen. Linda Puller [D] |
Sen. Roscoe Reynolds [D] | Sen. Walter Stosch [R] | Sen. Richard Stuart [R] | Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0840) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Enacted, Chapter 840 (effective 4/6/11) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB987ER2) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2011-04-06 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-05 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-26 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-24 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB987ER) | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Title replaced 11105245D-H1 | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB987H1 | |
2011-02-16 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11105245D-H1 | |
2011-02-16 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-15 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-14 | House: Committee substitute printed 11105245D-H1 | |
2011-02-14 | House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #2 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-01-28 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB987S1 | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11104648D-S1 | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Incorporates SB1358 | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104648D-S1 | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/12/11 11101918D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1358 (Similar To) 2011-01-25 - Senate: Incorporated by Finance (SB987-Puller) (14-Y 0-N)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 3219.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3219.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |