VA SB972 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Referred to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Vehicle registration fees; Public Safety Trust Fund. Imposes an additional $4 vehicle registration fee to be deposited into the Public Safety Trust Fund, established by the bill. The revenues in the Public Safety Trust Fund would be used to address staffing, retention, and pay suppression issues at the Department of State Police.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle registration fees; Public Safety Trust Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 7-N) (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Transportation (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-20HouseReported from Transportation (15-Y 7-N)
2020-02-18HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-18HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N)
2020-02-14HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Transportation Innovations and General Topics
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenateRead third time and passed Senate (31-Y 7-N)
2020-02-10SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB972S1
2020-02-10SenateSubstitute by Senator Edwards agreed to 20108052D-S1
2020-02-10SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-10SenateCommittee amendments rejected
2020-02-10SenateRead second time
2020-02-10SenateFloor substitute printed 20108052D-S1 (Edwards)
2020-02-07SenatePassed by for the day
2020-02-06SenatePassed by for the day
2020-02-06SenateRead second time
2020-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 2-N)
2020-01-30SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-30SenateReported from Transportation with amendments (11-Y 4-N)
2020-01-30SenateReconsiderd by Transportation
2020-01-23SenatePassed by indefinitely in Transportation (9-Y 5-N)
2020-01-15SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2020-01-15SenatePresented and ordered printed 20104768D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
462686(n/a)See Bill Text
462694(n/a)See Bill Text
462694.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB972
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB972+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB972E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB972S1+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S11V0022+SB0972
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S11V0042+SB0972
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0158+SB0972
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0357SB0972+SB0972
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0476SB0972+SB0972
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1903V0023+SB0972
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H19V0161+SB0972

Bill Comments

feedback