VA SB968 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0022)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0022)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; record exemption for certain health records. Clarifies that records of certain health care committees and entities, to the extent that they reveal information that may be withheld from discovery as privileged communications, are exempt from disclosure under FOIA.
Title
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; record exemption for certain health records.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 4-N) (Y: 97 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0022) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 22 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Friday, February 27, 2015 | |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/20/15 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB968ER) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-12 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 4-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Passed House (95-Y 4-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-10 | House | Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2015-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Assigned GL&T sub: #1 |
2015-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2015-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101515D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1633 (Same As) 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0127)