VA HB1633 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0127)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0127)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; record exemption for certain health records. Clarifies that records of certain health care committees and entities, to the extent that they reveal information that may be withheld from discovery as privileged communications, are exempt from disclosure under FOIA.
Title
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; record exemption for certain health records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 5-N) (Y: 96 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 5-N) (Y: 96 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0127) | |
2015-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 127 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1633ER) |
2015-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-02 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 5-N) |
2015-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House (94-Y 5-N) |
2015-01-30 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-27 | House | Reported from General Laws (20-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-15 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2015-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2015-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100958D |
Same As/Similar To
SB968 (Same As) 2015-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0022)