VA SB948 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0172)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0172)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Pharmacist scope of practice; initiation of treatment for certain diseases and conditions. Allows pharmacists to initiate treatment with, dispense, or administer controlled substances or devices for the initiation of treatment of group A Streptococcus bacteria infection, influenza virus infection, COVID-19 virus infection, and urinary tract infection to persons 18 years of age or older with whom the pharmacist has a bona fide pharmacist-patient relationship in accordance with regulations set forth by the Board of Pharmacy. The bill directs the Board of Pharmacy to adopt a statewide protocol for the initiation of treatment with and dispensing and administering of drugs and devices by pharmacists in accordance with the provisions of the bill by November 1, 2023. The bill provides that such protocol shall be developed by a work group consisting of representatives from the Board of Pharmacy, the Board of Medicine, and the Department of Health and directs the Board of Pharmacy to adopt emergency regulations to implement the provisions of the bill.
Title
Pharmacist scope of practice; initiation of treatment for certain diseases and conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (65-Y 34-N) (Y: 65 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (65-Y 34-N) (Y: 65 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0172) | |
2023-03-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 172 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB948ER) |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-20 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2023-02-17 | House | VOTE: Passage (65-Y 34-N) |
2023-02-17 | House | Passed House with amendments (65-Y 34-N) |
2023-02-17 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2023-02-17 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2023-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-14 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (12-Y 9-N) |
2023-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2023-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 23102717D-E |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB948E |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (14-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102717D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2274 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0171)
HB2274 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0171)
HB2274 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0171)