VA HB2274 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0171)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0171)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Pharmacist scope of practice; initiation of treatment for certain diseases and conditions. Allows pharmacists to initiate treatment with, dispense, or administer controlled substances or devices for the initiation of treatment of group A Streptococcus bacteria infection, influenza virus infection, COVID-19 virus infection, and urinary tract infection to persons 18 years of age or older with whom the pharmacist has a bona fide pharmacist-patient relationship in accordance with regulations set forth by the Board of Pharmacy. The bill directs the Board of Pharmacy to adopt a statewide protocol for the initiation of treatment with and dispensing and administering of drugs and devices by pharmacists in accordance with the provisions of the bill by November 1, 2023. The bill provides that such protocol shall be developed by a work group consisting of representatives from the Board of Pharmacy, the Board of Medicine, and the Department of Health and directs the Board of Pharmacy to adopt emergency regulations to implement the provisions of the bill.
Title
Pharmacist scope of practice; initiation of treatment for certain diseases and conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 42-N) (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (11-Y 10-N) (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 42-N) (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (11-Y 10-N) (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0171) | |
2023-03-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 171 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-16 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2274ER) |
2023-02-16 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-01-31 | House | VOTE: Passage (57-Y 42-N) |
2023-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House (57-Y 42-N) |
2023-01-30 | House | Printed as engrossed 23104138D-E |
2023-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2274E |
2023-01-30 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2023-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2023-01-27 | House | Passed by for the day |
2023-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-24 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (11-Y 10-N) |
2023-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 4-N) |
2023-01-13 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2023-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23104138D |
Same As/Similar To
SB948 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0172)
SB948 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0172)
SB948 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0172)