VA SB943 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-11 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-11 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Possession or transportation of firearms following convictions for certain misdemeanor crimes; restoration of rights; penalty. Prohibits a person who has been convicted of stalking, assault and battery of a family or household member, or sexual battery from possessing or transporting a firearm. A person who violates this provision is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill provides for a process by which a person convicted of such crimes may petition the circuit court for a reinstatement of his rights to possess or transport a firearm.
Title
Firearms; possession or transportation following convictions for certain misdemeanor crimes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (5-Y 10-N) (Y: 5 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (5-Y 10-N) (Y: 5 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-11 | Senate | Left in Finance |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104361D-S1 |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 4-N) |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Reconsidered by Courts of Justice |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (5-Y 10-N) |
2015-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102696D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 308.09 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.1:6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.2:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.2:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.2:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.28 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |