VA SB934 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Benefits consortium. Authorizes an association organized as a nonstock corporation whose members are employers conducting business in the Commonwealth to sponsor a trust. The measure authorizes the trust, called a benefits consortium, to sell benefits plans to its members. To be eligible to sponsor a plan, the association is required to have been actively in existence for 10 years, have at least five members, have been formed for purposes other than obtaining or providing health benefits, and operate as a nonprofit entity. A wholly owned subsidiary of such an entity is eligible to be a sponsoring association. The benefits plans may provide medical prescription drug, dental, and vision coverage for the employees of members and the sponsoring association and their dependents. The benefits may be self-funded or purchased from an insurer. The benefits consortium will be a multiple employer welfare arrangement subject to the provisions of the federal Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974. The measure exempts the benefits consortium from state taxation and insurance regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Benefits consortium; formation by a sponsoring association.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (18-Y 21-N) (Y: 18 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 46-N) (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2018-04-18 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 18, 2018
2018-04-18SenateCommunicated to Governor
2018-04-18SenateSenate rejected Governor's recommendation (18-Y 21-N)
2018-04-09SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2018-03-16 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-16SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018
2018-03-10SenateSigned by President
2018-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-08SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB934ER)
2018-03-08SenateEnrolled
2018-03-06HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 46-N)
2018-03-06HousePassed House (51-Y 46-N)
2018-03-06HouseRead third time
2018-03-05HouseRead second time
2018-03-01HouseReported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 9-N)
2018-02-08HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-02-08HouseRead first time
2018-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-02SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2018-02-01SenatePrinted as engrossed 18104849D-E
2018-02-01SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB934E
2018-02-01SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2018-02-01SenateReading of amendment waived
2018-02-01SenateRead second time
2018-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2018-01-29SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
2018-01-19SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-01-19SenatePresented and ordered printed 18104849D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591571(n/a)See Bill Text
591574(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback