VA SB919 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0625)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0625)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Administrative subpoenas; electronic communication services nondisclosure of subpoena. Authorizes the Attorney General, as attorneys for the Commonwealth are currently authorized, to issue administrative subpoenas to obtain certain records and other information from electronic communication service and remote computing service providers if relevant to a law-enforcement investigation of certain pornography, abduction, and prostitution crimes. The bill requires such subpoenas to contain a provision ordering the service provider not to notify or disclose the existence of the subpoena to another person, other than an attorney to obtain legal advice, for a period of 30 days after the date on which the service provider responds to the subpoena if the attorney for the Commonwealth or Attorney General makes written certification that there is reason to believe that the victim is under the age of 18 and that the disclosure of the existence of the subpoena will endanger the life or physical safety of an individual; lead to flight from prosecution, the destruction of or tampering with evidence, or the intimidation of potential witnesses; or otherwise seriously jeopardize an investigation.
Title
Administrative subpoenas; electronic communication services, sealing of subpoena.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (35-Y 2-N) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0625) | |
2015-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 625 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB919ER) |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-26 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (35-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2015-02-25 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-25 | House | Passed House with amendment (97-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-25 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2015-02-25 | House | No action taken on Amendment offered by Delegate Marshall, Robert G |
2015-02-25 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-25 | House | Pending question ordered |
2015-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-23 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB919S1 |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15103941D-S1 |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15103941D-S1 |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101301D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1946 (Same As) 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0544)