VA SB918 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0381)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0381)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Professional and occupational regulation; authority to suspend or revoke licenses, certificates, registrations, or permits; default or delinquency of education loan or scholarship. Provides that the Board of Education, the Board of Accountancy, and regulatory boards within the Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation and the Department of Health Professions shall not be authorized to suspend or revoke the license, certificate, registration, permit, or authority issued to any person who is in default or delinquent in the payment of a federal-guaranteed or state-guaranteed educational loan or work-conditional scholarship solely on the basis of such default or delinquency.
Title
Professional and occupational regulation; authority to suspend or revoke licenses, certificates.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] | Sen. Charles Carrico [R] | Sen. Siobhan Dunnavant [R] | Sen. John Edwards [D] |
Sen. Lynwood Lewis [D] | Sen. Mark Peake [R] | Sen. David Suetterlein [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0381) | |
2018-03-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 381 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-06 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018 |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB918ER) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-27 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | House | Passed House with amendments (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2018-02-23 | House | Amendments by Delegate Orrock agreed to |
2018-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-20 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB918S1 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18106731D-S1 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18106731D-S1 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18105102D |