VA SB912 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0368)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0368)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Management agreement between the Commonwealth and the College of William and Mary; responsibilities of building official. Removes the responsibility for building code compliance at Richard Bland College from the designated building official at the College of William and Mary.
Title
William and Mary, College of; management agreement between State.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0368) | |
2013-03-14 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 368 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB912ER) |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-15 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-15 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-13 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-28 | House | Assigned App. sub: Higher Education |
2013-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100751D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2249 (Same As) 2013-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0033)