VA SB910 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0351)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0351)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Military parents; delegation of visitation rights. Provides that in cases involving a parent who is a member of the military and who has been deployed on active duty, a court may enter an order (i) delegating the deploying parent's visitation rights with a child to a family member of the deploying parent or (ii) awarding visitation rights to a family member of the deploying parent if the parent had physical custody of the child prior to the deployment and physical custody is awarded to the nondeploying parent or his family during the deployment. Written notice of the return of the deployed parent or guardian and the termination of the delegated visitation shall be provided by the previously deployed parent or guardian to any family member whose visitation is thereby terminated. The bill also provides that the court may provide for the appearance of parties and witnesses via electronic means at any hearing under the Virginia Military Parents Equal Protection Act (§20-124.7 et seq.).
Title
Military parents; delegation of visitation rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0351) | |
2011-03-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 351 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB910ER) | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-24 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House | |
2011-02-24 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-23 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-21 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB910S1 | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11104312D-S1 | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104312D-S1 | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2011-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102393D |