VA SB897 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0751)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0751)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Child care providers; criminal history background check; penalty. Requires the following individuals to undergo a fingerprint-based national criminal history background check: (i) applicants for employment by, employees of, applicants to serve as volunteers with, and volunteers with any licensed family day system, child day center exempt from licensure pursuant to § 63.2-1716, registered family day home, or family day home approved by a family day system; (ii) applicants for licensure as a family day system, registration as a family day home, or approval as a family day home by a family day system, as well as their agents and any adult living in such family day home; and (iii) individuals who apply for or enter into a contract with the Department of Social Services under which a child day center, family day home, or child day program will provide child care services funded by the Child Care and Development Block Grant, as well as the applicant's current or prospective employees and volunteers, agents, and any adult living in the child day center or family day home. The bill also mandates that all background checks required pursuant to §§ 63.2-1720.1 and 63.2-1721.1 be completed by September 30, 2017, or by the date specified on any federal waiver obtained by the Commonwealth, and every five years thereafter. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2018. The bill further provides that if any provision of the federal Child Care and Development Block Grant Act of 2014 establishing a corresponding requirement is repealed prior to July 1, 2018, the provision of the bill establishing such requirement shall expire upon the date of such repeal. This bill is identical to HB 1568.
Title
Child care providers; criminal history background check; penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 22-N) (Y: 77 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 22-N) (Y: 77 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0751) | |
2017-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 751 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB897ER) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-15 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 22-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed House with amendments (77-Y 22-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2017-02-15 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-15 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-13 | House | Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-09 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-09 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (16-Y 6-N) |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB897S1 |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104091D-S1 |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 2-N) |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104091D-S1 |
2016-12-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2016-12-21 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100203D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 2 | 1720 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1721.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1722 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1724 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1725 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |